03.06.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
25.06.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
17.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
25.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.06.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
08.06.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
05.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
14.07.2006 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
14.07.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
03.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] |
13.01.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] |
27.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|