Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008267853 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27190505 | 14.11.2005 | JP2003133992 | 13.05.2003 | WO2004JP06810 | 13.05.2004 | US14656308 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7442356 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2008 | B2 | US2006067864 | 30.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003133992 | 13.05.2003 | WO2004JP06810 | 13.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4549295B | Global Dossier | 22.09.2010 | B2 | JPWO2004101139 | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003133992 | 13.05.2003 | WO2004JP06810 | 13.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1629883 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2010 | B1 | EP1629883 | 11.07.2007 | A4 | EP1629883 | 01.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003133992 | 13.05.2003 | WO2004JP06810 | 13.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004028364D1 | 09.09.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003133992 | 13.05.2003 | WO2004JP06810 | 13.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004101139 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003133992 | 13.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100957481B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2010 | B1 | KR20060012574 | 08.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003133992 | 13.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100425335C | 15.10.2008 | C | CN1787874 | 14.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003133992 | 13.05.2003 |