EP1625630 - PIEZOELECTRIC COMPOSITES AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/07] | PIEZOELECTRIC COMPOSITES AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
[2007/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visualsonics, Inc. Suite 6100, Box 66 3080 Yonge Street Toronto, Ontario M4N 3N1 / CA | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states Visualsonics, Inc. 3080 Yonge Street Suite 6020 Box 89 Toronto M4N 3N1 / CA | ||
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Visualsonics, Inc. 3080 Young Street, Suite 6020, Box 89 Toronto M4N 3N1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIN, Jainhua 2 Fort Dearborn Drive Scarborough, Ontario M1V 3A5 / CA | 02 /
FOSTER, Francis, Stuart 24 Glen Oak Drive Toronto, Ontario M4E 1Y5 / CA | 03 /
HARASIEWICZ, Katarzyna, Anna 2 Henderson Avenue Thornhill, Ontario L3T 2KR / CA | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Power, Philippa Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Power, Philippa Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04733053.5 | 14.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004IB02132 | Priority number, date | US20030470235P | 14.05.2003 Original published format: US 470235 P | US20030726805 | 03.12.2003 Original published format: US 726805 | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004102795 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1625630 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625630 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/24, H01L41/18, B06B1/06 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
B06B1/0622 (EP,US);
H10N30/092 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1052 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1062 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1064 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1074 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHE KOMPOSITMATERIALIEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/07] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC COMPOSITES AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2007/19] | French: | CORPS COMPOSITES PIEZO-ELECTRIQUES ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [2006/07] |
Former [2006/07] | PIEZOELECTRIC COMPOSITES AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2007 | BE | 14.11.2007 | CH | 14.11.2007 | CY | 14.11.2007 | CZ | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | LI | 14.11.2007 | PL | 14.11.2007 | RO | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | BG | 14.02.2008 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | ES | 25.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | IE | 14.05.2008 | LU | 14.05.2008 | HU | 15.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LU | 14.05.2008 | ||
HU | 15.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LU | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0638297 ; | [I]EP0602261 (ACUSON [US]); |