|
10.03.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.04.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.03.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.03.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2013 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2005 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2004 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |