23.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
09.09.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
07.03.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
29.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
15.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.11.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
30.11.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
14.11.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
03.12.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
03.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
30.06.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.12.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.08.2009 |
First examination report |
|
24.08.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
23.06.2006 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
23.06.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
30.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
23.12.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
18.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|