EP1623730 - AIR PRESSURES-ACTUATED DRIVER FOR PNEUMATIC VENTRICULAR ASSISTANCE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitalmex Internacional, S.A. de C.V. Moctezuma 26 Col. Torriello Guerra, C.P. 14050 México D.F. / MX | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Vitalmex Internacional, S.A. de C.V. Moctezuma 26 Col. Torriello Guerra, C.P. 14050 Mexico D.F. / MX | ||
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Vitalmex Internacional, S.A. de C.V. Moctezuma 26 Col. Torriello Guerra, C.P. 11050 Mexico D.F. / MX | ||
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Innovamédica S.A. de C.V. Cantil No. 175 Casa 4 Col. Jardines Del Pedregal 01900 Tlalpan, Mexico, DF / MX | ||
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states SACRISTAN ROCK, Emilio Cerrada del Convento No. 45-11, Santa Ursula Xitla C.P. 01442 México, D.F. / MX | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sacristán, Emilio Cerrada del Convento No. 45-11 Santa Ursula Xitla, CP 01442 Mexico D.F. / MX | [2006/30] |
Former [2006/06] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2013/01] |
Former [2010/31] | Gemmell, Peter Alan, et al Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | ||
Former [2006/06] | Bone, Alexander Marcus Thomas, et al Dummett Copp 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04733212.7 | 14.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004MX00032 | Priority number, date | US20030470711P | 15.05.2003 Original published format: US 470711 P | US20040846983 | 13.05.2004 Original published format: US 846983 | [2006/06] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004101030 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1623730 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1623730 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
A61M60/43 (EP,BR,US);
A61M60/117 (EP,BR,US);
A61M2205/42 (EP,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2209/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Title | German: | DURCH LUFTDRUCK AKTIVIERTER ANTRIEB FÜR PNEUMATISCHE VENTRIKULARE UNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2006/06] | English: | AIR PRESSURES-ACTUATED DRIVER FOR PNEUMATIC VENTRICULAR ASSISTANCE DEVICES | [2006/06] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE ACTIONNE PAR PRESSION D'AIR POUR DISPOSITIFS D'ASSISTANCE VENTRICULAIRE PNEUMATIQUES | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2005 | Translation filed | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | IE | 14.05.2013 | LU | 14.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/34] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 14.05.2013 | ||
LU | 14.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 14.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 14.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 02.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4634430 (POLASCHEGG HANS-DIETRICH [DE]) [A] 1,11,12,14* column 5, line 17 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [X]US5913814 (ZANTOS GEORGE N [US]) [X] 1,4-12,14 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 38; figure 1 *; | [XA]US6098405 (MIYATA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 14 * column 18, line 1 - line 21 * * column 23, line 7 - line 11 * * column 27, line 6 - line 11 * [A] 2,3,13 |