EP1631745 - VANE-CELL PUMP PROVIDED WITH A DEEP-DRAWN METAL-SHEET POT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ixetic Hückeswagen GmbH Industriestrasse 8 42499 Hückeswagen / DE | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states LuK Automobiltechnik GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 8 42499 Hückeswagen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ-ANDRES, Heiko Lessingstrasse 2d 42499 Hückeswagen / DE | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/10] | Duschl, Edgar Johannes LuK GmbH & Co. oHG Industriestrasse 3 D-77815 Bühl / DE | Application number, filing date | 04733242.4 | 15.05.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004DE01032 | Priority number, date | DE2003123572 | 26.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10323572 | [2006/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109111 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631745 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1631745 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/344 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
F01C21/10 (EP,US);
F04C2/344 (KR);
F04C18/344 (KR);
F04C2/3446 (EP,US);
F04C2230/24 (EP,US);
F04C2240/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜGELZELLENPUMPE MIT TIEFGEZOGENEM STAHLBLECHTOPF | [2006/10] | English: | VANE-CELL PUMP PROVIDED WITH A DEEP-DRAWN METAL-SHEET POT | [2006/10] | French: | POMPE À CELLULES EN AILETTES À POT EN TÔLE D'ACIER EMBOUTIE | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | IE | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | PL | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | HU | 08.05.2008 | AT | 15.05.2008 | LU | 15.05.2008 | BE | 31.05.2008 | CH | 31.05.2008 | LI | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
HU | 08.05.2008 | ||
AT | 15.05.2008 | ||
LU | 15.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
AT | 15.05.2008 | ||
LU | 15.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
AT | 15.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | NL | 07.11.2007 | |
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 07.11.2007 | |
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5797091 ; | [A]US4656710 (MACIEJEWSKI NOMAN [US]) [A] 1-20* column 3, line 23 - line 32; figures 2-5 *; | [X]FR2660221 (BARMAC LUK AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GM [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 15 - line 18; figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 14 *; | [A]EP0644317 (SIHI GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19913632 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 11 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820929), vol. 0061, no. 90, Database accession no. (M - 159), & JP57097091 A 19820616 (KAYABA IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * |