EP1629455 - AN IMPROVED DRIVING SCHEME FOR AN ELECTROPHORETIC DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adrea LLC 920 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2012/12] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Adrea LLC 955 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | ||
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Guofu P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Mark T. P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/25] | Bekkers, Joost J.J, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/09] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04733406.5 | 17.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004IB01700 | Priority number, date | US20030473208P | 23.05.2003 Original published format: US 473208 P | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004104977 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629455 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
G09G3/344 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G3/38 (KR);
G09G2300/08 (EP,US);
G09G2310/06 (EP,US);
G09G2310/068 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES ANSTEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EINE ELEKTROPHORETISCHE ANZEIGE | [2006/09] | English: | AN IMPROVED DRIVING SCHEME FOR AN ELECTROPHORETIC DISPLAY | [2006/09] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXCITATION PERFECTIONNE POUR AFFICHEUR ELECTROPHORETIQUE | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002196207 (MACHIDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US6504524 (GATES HOLLY [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1490858 | EP1512136 |