EP1624323 - REFLECTIVE BODY, USE THEREOF, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING REFLECTIVE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1-5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Koichi c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
KOIKE, Katsuhiko c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
FUKUDA, Shin c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04733470.1 | 17.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004JP06987 | Priority number, date | JP20030138018 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003138018 | [2006/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004102231 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624323 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08, F21V7/22, F21V8/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
G02B5/0858 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0031 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0055 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S359/90 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/34] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFLEKTIERENDER KÖRPER, VERWENDUNG DAFÜR UND VERFAHERN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES REFLEKTIERENDEN KÖRPERS | [2006/06] | English: | REFLECTIVE BODY, USE THEREOF, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING REFLECTIVE BODY | [2006/06] | French: | CORPS REFLECTEUR, SON UTILISATION, ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2005 | Translation filed | 14.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 07.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002116313 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]JP2000221311 (OIKE KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH01310302 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]EP0516489 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) |