EP1629193 - AN ELECTRICAL POWER GENERATION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOTT, David Sydney 28 Poulteney Drive, Quorn Loughborough LE12 8EY / GB | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04733590.6 | 18.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004GB02128 | Priority number, date | GB20030011536 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: GB 0311536 | GB20040005115 | 06.03.2004 Original published format: GB 0405115 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004104413 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629193 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1629193 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/04, F03D1/00 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D9/25 (EP,US);
F03D1/04 (EP,US);
F05B2240/31 (EP,US);
F05B2240/921 (EP,US);
F05B2240/922 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/34] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINE STROMERZEUGUNGSANLAGE | [2006/09] | English: | AN ELECTRICAL POWER GENERATION ASSEMBLY | [2006/09] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE GENERATION DE PUISSANCE ELECTRIQUE | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 29.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE830628 (JOHANN ADAM HEUBECK DIPL ING) [X] 43,44 * column W *; | [A]FR2381921 (RATTIN ANGE [FR]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE2907187 (HOEPPNER HELMUT DIPL ING) [A] 1,13,14,16-21,23,26,30 * column W *; | [A]DE3120997 (GRAZ FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM [AT]) [A] 1-3,14-18,20,21,26-28,30 * column W *; | [XA]GB2212563 (POHL LOTHAR LOUIS) [X] 39 * column W * [A] 1; | [A]US5484257 (OSBORN NORBERT L [US]) [A] 1* column W *; | [XA]WO9913220 (BAKKUM THEODORUS ISTVAN VAN [NL]) [X] 39,43 * column W * [A] 1 |