EP1631340 - PORTABLE RESPIRATORY DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miller, Thomas P. 3123 Uplands, S.E. Grand Rapids, MI 49506 / US | [2006/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04733614.4 | 18.05.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004IB50732 | Priority number, date | US20030453801 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: US 453801 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004105845 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631340 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1631340 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/4839 (EP,US);
A61B5/085 (EP,US);
A61B5/087 (EP,US);
A61M16/0063 (EP,US);
A61M16/10 (EP,US);
A61B5/091 (EP,US);
A61M16/0051 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/1055 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES DIAGNOSTISCHES BEATMUNGSGERÄT | [2006/10] | English: | PORTABLE RESPIRATORY DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE | [2006/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTATIF DE DIAGNOSTIC RESPIRATOIRE | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | BE | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IT | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | IE | 18.05.2009 | LU | 18.05.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | ES | 29.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 18.05.2009 | ||
LU | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 18.05.2009 | ||
LU | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 18.02.2009 | |
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 18.02.2009 | |
ES | 29.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8910768 (SIPIN ANATOLE J [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 6, line 26 - page 12, line 9 *; | [XA]WO9611717 (BIRD PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 9 - page 8, line 21 * * page 14, line 27 - page 25, line 33 * * page 27, line 24 - page 28, line 1; figures 1,2 * [A] 5; | [X]EP1108391 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0049] - [0072]; figure - *; | [AD]US6257234 (SUN JIANGUO [US]) [AD] 1-5* the whole document *; | [X]US2003010339 (BANNER MICHAEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0042] - [0057]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | DE4307754 |