EP1631521 - TELESCOPIC PUSH ARM, PARTICULARLY FOR A LOAD-RECEIVING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TGW Mechanics GmbH Collmannstrasse 2 4600 Wels / AT | [2010/46] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states TGW Transportgeräte GmbH Collmannstrasse 2 4600 Wels / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSL, Rudolf Händelstrasse 22 A-4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
REISCHL, Josef Kamillenweg 1 A-4623 Gunskirchen / AT | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes, et al Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Burger, Hannes, et al Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | ||
Former [2006/10] | Secklehner, Günter Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 04733730.8 | 19.05.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004AT00175 | Priority number, date | AT20030000778 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: AT 7782003 | [2006/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103883 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631521 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1631521 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/41] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1631521 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/14, B66F9/07, B65G1/04 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
B65G1/0435 (EP,US);
B66F9/07 (EP,US);
B66F9/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELESKOPSCHUBARM, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN LASTAUFNAHMEMITTEL | [2006/10] | English: | TELESCOPIC PUSH ARM, PARTICULARLY FOR A LOAD-RECEIVING MEANS | [2006/10] | French: | BRAS DE POUSSEE TELESCOPIQUE UTILISE EN PARTICULIER POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE RECEPTION DE CHARGES | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10012647.3 / EP2272787 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | IE | 13.10.2010 | IT | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | AT | 19.05.2011 | GB | 19.05.2011 | LU | 19.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | FR | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
AT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2011 | ||
LU | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
AT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2011 | ||
LU | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
AT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2011 | ||
LU | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
AT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3402836 (DEBREY ROBERT J, et al) [A] * column 3, line 70 - column 4, line 65 * * column 6, line 7 - line 28 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE3739136 (MAN LAGER & SYSTEMTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,12,41* the whole document *; | [A]CH678310 (MANITEC AG) [A] 1,12,26,41 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4217084 (DAIFUKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,12,41 * abstract *; | [A]WO03019425 (TGW TRANSPORTGERAETE GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1,12,26,41 * page 26, line 21 - line 35 * * figure 4 *; | [PDA]US2003185656 (HANSL RUDOLF [AT]) [PDA] 1,12,26,41 * the whole document * |