EP1629094 - METHOD FOR ISOLATING OR PURIFYING STAPHYLOCOCCUS UMP KINASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOIG, Peter Clifford AstraZeneca R & D Boston, 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2006/09] | Application number, filing date | 04733841.3 | 19.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004GB02158 | Priority number, date | GB20030011789 | 22.05.2003 Original published format: GB 0311789 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004104192 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629094 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/12, C07K14/31, C12Q1/48 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
C12N9/1229 (EP);
C12Y207/04014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG UND REINIGUNG DER UMP KUNASE VON STAPHYLOCOCCUS | [2006/09] | English: | METHOD FOR ISOLATING OR PURIFYING STAPHYLOCOCCUS UMP KINASE | [2006/09] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ISOLER ET PURIFIER UNE UMP KINASE DE STAPHYLOCOCCUS | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/46] | 13.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO9955729 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP) [XD] 1-6,8-11,13-19 * page 28 - page 29 * [Y] 1-25; | [XY]WO03035858 (CANADIEN VERONICA ; BEATTIE BRYAN (CA); DHARAMSI AKIL (CA); HOUSTON SI) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-25 * page 41 - page 43; figures 10-17; tables 3,4; sequences 14,16 * [Y] 1-25; | [XY]WO03029484 (ARVIDSON STAFFAN ; TOMICH CHE-SHEN C (US); MOTT JOHN E (US); UPJOHN CO) [X] 1-6,8-13,18-25 * figure 3; example 7; sequences 33,87,88 * [Y] 1-25; | [Y]US2002119506 (BARZU OCTAVIAN ET AL) [Y] 1-25 * pages 1,3,4 - page 6 *; | [YD]US6403337 (BAILEY CAMELLA ET AL) [YD] 1-25 * sequence 39 *; | [Y] - SERINA L ET AL, "ESCHERICHIA COLI UMP-KINASE, A MEMBER OF THE ASPARTOKINASE FAMILY, IS A HEXAMER REGULATED BY GUANINE NUCLEOTIDES AND UTP", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, US, (1995), vol. 34, no. 15, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 5066 - 5074, XP002921636 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00015a018 | [PX] - GAGYI CRISTINA ET AL, "UMP kinase from the Gram-positive bacterium Bacillus subtilis is strongly dependent on GTP for optimal activity.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (200308), vol. 270, no. 15, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 3196 - 3204, XP002299396 [PX] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1033.2003.03702.x |