EP1633904 - METHODS FOR FORMING ALUMINUM CONTAINING FILMS UTILIZING AMINO ALUMINUM PRECURSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states L'air liquide, Société anonyme à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés G. Claude 75 quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JURSICH, Gregory, M. 112 Tuttle Avenue Clarendon Hills, IL 60514 / US | 02 /
INMAN, Ronald, S. 4540 Warsaw Avenue Lyons, IL 60534 / US | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [2006/11] | Vesin, Jacques L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Intellectuelle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04733869.4 | 19.05.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004IB01642 | Priority number, date | US20030476273P | 05.06.2003 Original published format: US 476273 P | US20030514757P | 27.10.2003 Original published format: US 514757 P | US20040844579 | 13.05.2004 Original published format: US 844579 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004108985 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1633904 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633904 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/40, C23C16/34, C23C16/30, H01L21/316 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
C23C16/45553 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/31 (KR);
C23C16/403 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02178 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02181 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02194 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02205 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0228 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/3145 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ALUMINIUMHALTIGER FILME MITTELS AMINO-ALUMINIUM PRECURSOREN | [2006/11] | English: | METHODS FOR FORMING ALUMINUM CONTAINING FILMS UTILIZING AMINO ALUMINUM PRECURSORS | [2006/11] | French: | PROCEDES DE FORMATION DE COUCHES A BASE D'ALUMINIUM A L'AIDE DE PRECURSEURS AMINO-ALUMINES | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2009 | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IT | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | PL | 11.02.2009 | RO | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | SE | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | IE | 19.05.2009 | LU | 19.05.2009 | ES | 22.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | HU | 12.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.05.2009 | ||
LU | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
HU | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.05.2009 | ||
LU | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 11.02.2009 | |
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 11.02.2009 | |
ES | 22.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPS62276832 ; | [XY]WO0227063 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12,13 * examples 12,14,19,21; claims 1,31,32; tables 1,2 * [Y] 9-11; | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880519), vol. 0121, no. 67, Database accession no. (E - 610), & JP62276832 A 19871201 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 9-11 * abstract * [A] 1-4 | [A] - RIE K -T ET AL, "Plasma-CVD of TiCN and ZrCN films on light metals", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY ELSEVIER SWITZERLAND, (19990201), vol. 112, no. 1-3, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 226 - 229, XP002305367 [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1; table 1 * | [A] - TAKAHASHI Y ET AL, "Low temperature deposition of a refractory aluminium compound by the thermal decomposition of aluminium dialkylamides", SURFACE SCIENCE NETHERLANDS, (19790702), vol. 86, no. 2, ISSN 0039-6028, pages 238 - 245, XP008038340 [A] 1-13 * page 238 - page 240 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0039-6028(79)90400-X |