EP1626330 - PORTABLE TERMINAL DEVICE WITH BUILT-IN FINGERPRINT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2012 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | 11.04.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Koki; c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CO. 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1058717 / JP | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2006/07] | Application number, filing date | 04733974.2 | 19.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004JP07151 | Priority number, date | JP20030142934 | 21.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003142934 | [2006/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004104813 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626330 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06K9/00, H04M1/67 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
H04M1/67 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,KR,US);
G06F18/00 (KR);
G06F21/32 (KR);
G06V40/13 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/0338 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/07] | G06F3/033, G06F1/00, H04M1/67 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2006/35] |
Former [2006/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE ENDGERÄTEINRICHTUNG MIT EINGEBAUTEM FINGERABDRUCKSENSOR | [2006/07] | English: | PORTABLE TERMINAL DEVICE WITH BUILT-IN FINGERPRINT SENSOR | [2006/07] | French: | EQUIPEMENT TERMINAL PORTATIF COMPRENANT UN LECTEUR D'EMPREINTE DIGITALE INCORPORE | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2005 | Translation filed | 13.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 02.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0042493 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [X]EP1113385 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]); | [A]US2002122026 (BERGSTROM DEAN WARREN [US]); | [XI]US2003048260 (MATUSIS ALEC [US]) | International search | [X]JP2002044727 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2002041169 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2002062983 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2002183076 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JP2002352234 (SHARP KK); |