EP1633681 - A SWIMMING POOL CLEANING AND SANITISING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enviro Swim Pty Ltd ACN 106 998 967 32 Bay Street Southport QLD 4215 / AU | [2013/12] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Enviro Swim Pty Ltd CAN 106 998 967 32 Bay Street Southport QLD 4215 / AU | ||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Watertech Holdings Ltd. 28th Floor Tesbury Centre 28 Queens Road East Wanchai, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Philip, Henry 3 Cromwell Court Tallai, Queensland 4213 / AU | 02 /
STUTT, Gary, Arthur, Unit 29 226 Cheltenham Drive Robina, Queensland 4226 / AU | [2013/12] |
Former [2006/11] | 01 /
JONES, Philip, Henry 3 Cromwell Court Tallai, Queensland 4213 / AU | ||
02 /
STUTT, Gary, Arthur, Unit 29 226 Cheltenham Drive Robina, Queensland 4226 / AU | Representative(s) | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al LARSEN & BIRKEHOLM A/S Skandinavisk Patentbureau Banegårdspladsen 1 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al Larsen & Birkeholm A/S Skandinavisk Patentbureau Banegaardspladsen 1 P.O. Box 362 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 04734177.1 | 21.05.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004AU00681 | Priority number, date | AU20030902540 | 23.05.2003 Original published format: AU 2003902540 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103912 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633681 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633681 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/46, C02F1/36, C02F1/467 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
C02F1/36 (EP,US);
C02F1/4606 (EP,US);
C02F1/4672 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46142 (EP,US);
C02F2103/42 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4613 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/11] | C02F1/36, C02F1/72, C02F1/467 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Title | German: | SCHWIMMBADREINIGUNGS- UND -DESINFEKTIONSSYSTEM | [2006/11] | English: | A SWIMMING POOL CLEANING AND SANITISING SYSTEM | [2006/11] | French: | SYSTEME DE DESINFECTION ET DE NETTOYAGE DE PISCINE | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2004 | AT | 20.03.2013 | BE | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | NL | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | IE | 21.05.2013 | LU | 21.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 21.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 20.03.2013 | |
BG | 20.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6238546 (KNIEPER LOUIS H [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 43 - line 45 * * column 5, line 39 - line 57 * * column 10, line 45 - line 48 * * column 13, line 40 - line 49 *; | [A]DE19951461 (STRELE WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-14* claim 1 *; | [PX]US2003164308 (SCHLAGER KENNETH J [US], et al) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1,4,8 * | International search | [A]RU2043974 ; | [A]WO9711908 (NAT ENGINEERING RESEARCH CENTE [CN], et al); | [A]DE19951461 (STRELE WOLFGANG [DE]); | [A]WO02062709 (ACCENTUS PLC [GB], et al); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1996-220362, XP008100438 & RU2043974 C1 19950920 (DNEPR MECH ENG WORKS PRODN ASSOC) | by applicant | US6238546 | - AGGAZZOTTI, G. ET AL., "Blood and breath analyses as biological indicators of exposure to trihalomethanes in indoor swimming pools", SCIENCE OF THE TOTAL ENVIRONMENT, (1998), vol. 217, pages 155 - 163 | - LINDSTROM, A.B.; PLEIL, J.D.; BERKOFF, D.C., "Alveolar breath sampling and analysis to assess trihalomethane exposures during competitive swimming training", ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH PERSPECTIVES, (1997), vol. 105, no. 6, pages 636 - 642 | - DROBNIC, F. ET AL., "Assessment of chlorine exposure in swimmers during training", MEDICINE AND SCIENCE IN SPORTS AND EXERCISE, (1996), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 271 - 274 |