EP1651308 - IMPLANTABLE STIMULATION ELECTRODE WITH A COATING FOR INCREASING TISSUE COMPATIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [2011/17] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Biotronik SE & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYER, Gerd Sieglitzhofer Strasse 36 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
BORCK, Alexander Hirschberg 23 91086 Aurachtal / DE | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/18] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04734260.5 | 21.05.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004EP05550 | Priority number, date | DE2003128816 | 21.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10328816 | [2006/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004112891 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651308 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651308 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61L31/16, A61L31/10, A61L31/04, A61L26/00, A61K47/48, C08L5/08, C08B37/00 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
C08L5/08 (EP,US);
A61K47/6957 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61N1/0568 (EP,US);
C08B37/0072 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, C08L5/08 (EP,US);
C08L5/08, C08L2666/26 (US,EP);
C09D105/08, C08L2666/26 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE STIMULATIONSELEKTRODE MIT EINER BESCHICHTUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER GEWEBSVERTRÄGLICHKEIT | [2006/18] | English: | IMPLANTABLE STIMULATION ELECTRODE WITH A COATING FOR INCREASING TISSUE COMPATIBILITY | [2006/18] | French: | ELECTRODE DE STIMULATION IMPLANTABLE POURVUE D'UN REVETEMENT DESTINE A AUGMENTER LA COMPATIBILITE TISSULAIRE | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.10.2010 | 22.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | IT | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | AT | 21.05.2011 | LU | 21.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
AT | 21.05.2011 | ||
LU | 21.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
AT | 21.05.2011 | ||
LU | 21.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
AT | 21.05.2011 | ||
LU | 21.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
AT | 21.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 12.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9812243 (FOCAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 2, line 28 - page 36, line 21 *; | [X]US5820917 (TUCH RONALD J [US]) [X] 1-22 * column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 29 *; | [X]US5866113 (HENDRIKS MARC [NL], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 2, line 11 - column 8, line 6 *; | [X]US2003091609 (HENDRIKS MARC [NL]) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0065] *; | [X]US2003091827 (ZAMORA PAUL O [US], et al) [X] 1-22* paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0049] * | by applicant | US4582865 | EP0453117 | US5080099 | WO9302739 | US5510121 | US5527893 | US5550187 | US5585361 | DE19630563 | WO0046252 | WO0056377 | - DANISHEFSKY, ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1960), vol. 90, page 114 FF | - NAGASAWA, CARBOHYDR. RES., (1977), vol. 58, page 47 FF | - AYOTTE, CARBOHYDR. RES., (1986), vol. 145, page 267 FF | - OGAMO, CARBOHYDR. RES., (1989), vol. 193, page 165 FF | - JESAJA, CAN. J. CHEM., (1989), vol. 67, page 1449 FF | - MULLOY, CARBOHYDR. RES., (1994), vol. 255, page 1 FF | - "A 340 kDa hyaluronic acid secreted by human vascular smooth muscle cells regulates their proliferation and migration", PAPAKONSTANTINOU; G. KARAKIULAKIS; O. EICKELBERG; A.P. PERRUCHOUD; L.H. BLOCK; M. ROTH, Glycobiology, (1998), vol. 8, pages 821 - 830 |