EP1631606 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A POLYISOCYANURATE POLYURETHANE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | [2011/34] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City Utah 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLEYS, Gerhard Jozef Bremstraat 19 B-3001 Heverlee / BE | 02 /
LEENSLAG, Jan Willem Rechtestraat 10 B-3120 Tremelo / BE | 03 /
VERBEKE, Hans Godelieve Guido Langebeekstraat 24 B-3210 Linden / BE | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H., et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H., et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | ||
Former [2006/10] | Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H., et al HUNTSMAN (EUROPE) BVBA, Intellectual Property Department, Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 04734526.9 | 24.05.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004EP50898 | Priority number, date | EP20030013241 | 12.06.2003 Original published format: EP 03013241 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004111101 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631606 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1631606 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/09, C08G18/22, C08G18/48, C08G18/79 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
C08G18/225 (EP,US);
C08G18/09 (KR);
B29C48/686 (EP,US);
C08G18/48 (KR);
C08G18/4837 (EP,US);
C08G18/79 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POLYISOCYANURAT-POLYURETHANMATERIALS | [2006/10] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A POLYISOCYANURATE POLYURETHANE MATERIAL | [2006/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE MATERIAU DE POLYISOCYANURATE POLYURETHANE | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 30.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2004 | AT | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | IE | 24.05.2012 | LU | 24.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
LU | 24.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
PT | 26.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB1433642 (CELOTEX CORP) [AD] 1,2* example I; claim 1 *; | [A]US4424288 (PATTON JR JOHN T [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4661533 (STOBBY WILLIAM G [US]) [A] 1,2 * example 2 *; | [AD]WO0200752 (HUNTSMAN INT LLC [US], et al) [AD] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE10145458 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0046] - [0050]; example 1; claim 1 * | Examination | JPS5175798 | GB1491620 | JPS6099120 | JPS6099121 | JPS63245420 | by applicant | GB1433642 | US4129697 | US4247656 | US4424288 | US4661533 | EP0587317 | EP0608626 | EP0745627 | WO9800450 | EP0922063 | WO0029459 | WO0200752 | EP1173495 | WO0206370 | WO0210249 | DE10145458 |