EP1646308 - BRUSH ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOHLRUSS, Gregor Zur Rampe 5 46414 Rhede / DE | For all designated states WIESNER, Hubert Grüner Weg 21 D-46354 Südlohn / DE | For all designated states GRIEBE, Oliver Mühlenweg 22 46414 Rhede / DE | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Schneiders, Josef Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Schneiders, Josef Schneiders & Behrendt, Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte, Huestrasse 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 04735005.3 | 27.05.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004EP05691 | Priority number, date | DE2003131223 | 10.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10331223 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005004693 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1646308 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1646308 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47L1/15, A47L13/46 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
A47L13/46 (EP,US);
A47L1/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BÜRSTENSYSTEM | [2006/16] | English: | BRUSH ASSEMBLY | [2006/16] | French: | ENSEMBLE BROSSE | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 02.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002143065 ; | [X]DE523147 (FRIEDRICH SCHNAKENBERG) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR711452 (G. GAUTREAU) [A] 11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2029426 (KINGDON RALPH H) [A] 6,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2205535 (OTTILIE MUCKENHIRN) [A] 5,6 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2454668 (DANIEL NISSENBAUM MOSES) [X] 1,8,11,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2516396 (KERSH RALPH C) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2527089 (ADAMS ARTHUR T) [A] 8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2560008 (STEWARD DON C) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002158481 (MANDLE JAMES S [US], et al) [A] 11* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002143065 A 20020521 (LION CORP) [X] 1,6,7,9 * the whole document * |