EP1634288 - CONDITIONAL ACCESS TO STORED CONTENT USING NON-STANDARD MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERDORFER, Wolfgang Triester Strasse 64 A-1101 Vienna / AT | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/11] | Röggla, Harald Philips Austria GmbH Intellectual Property & Standards, Triester Strasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 04735314.9 | 28.05.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004IB50802 | Priority number, date | EP20030101589 | 02.06.2003 Original published format: EP 03101589 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004107326 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1634288 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G11B20/00927 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDINGTER ZUGRIFF AUF GESPEICHERTEN INHALT UNTER VERWENDUNG VON NICHT-STANDARD-MEDIEN | [2006/11] | English: | CONDITIONAL ACCESS TO STORED CONTENT USING NON-STANDARD MEDIA | [2006/11] | French: | ACCES CONDITIONNEL PERMETTANT LA MEMORISATION DE CONTENUS A L'AIDE DE SUPPORTS NON NORMALISES | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 21.07.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/50] | 28.07.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9854713 (DILLA LIMITED C [GB]) [X] 1,3-5,7-10,18-21 * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 30 * * page 12, line 13 - page 15, line 17; figures 1,2,5,6 * [Y] 15-17; | [XY]US6005839 (SAKO YOICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9-13,17,18 * column 3, line 65 - column 10, line 9; figures 4,7-9 * [Y] 15-17; | [X]US5418852 (ITAMI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,10,18-21 * column 15, line 4 - column 18, line 34; figures 17-32 *; | [X]WO0203386 (VERIFICATION TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,10 * page 7 - page 8 * * page 25, line 26 - page 26, line 13 * * page 34, line 19 - page 38, line 28; figures 8,9 *; | [X]US5572589 (WATERS LESTER L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 59; figures 4-7 *; | [A]EP0741382 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * column 3 - column 4 * | Examination | US5844911 | by applicant | WO9854713 | US6005839 | US5418852 | US5844911 | WO0143123 |