EP1627547 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING PUBLIC LONG CODE MASK IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2015/34] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AN, Jong Hoe 971-2 Hogye 3-dong, Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KYUNG, Chan Ho Wookil APT., 104 Na-dong,Bukye 3-dong, Bupyoung-ku Incheon 403-806 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Kyoo Jin 506-801, Kongjak APT., 1587 Gwanyang-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Kyeonggi-do 431-060 / KR | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/08] | 01 /
AN, Jong Hoe 971-2 Hokye 3-dong,Dongan-ku, Anyang-shi Gyeonggi-do 431-849 / KR | ||
02 /
KYUNG, Chan Ho Wookil APT., 104 Na-dong,Bukye 3-dong, Bupyoung-ku Incheon 403-806 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Kyoo Jin 506-801, Kongjak APT., 1587 Gwanyang-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Kyeonggi-do 431-060 / KR | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2015/52] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/08] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04735489.9 | 31.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004IB01793 | Priority number, date | KR20030034236 | 29.05.2003 Original published format: KR 2003034236 | KR20030055136 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: KR 2003055136 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004107796 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1627547 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627547 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/26 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04J13/105 (EP,US);
H04J13/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/08] | H04Q7/38, H04B7/216 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER ÖFFENTLICHEN LANGCODE-MASKE IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2006/08] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING PUBLIC LONG CODE MASK IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2006/08] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER UN MASQUE A LONG CODE PUBLIC DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2004 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | GR | 24.03.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | GB | 31.05.2016 | IE | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | LU | 31.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 31.05.2004 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 31.05.2016 | ||
IE | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.05.2004 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 31.05.2016 | ||
IE | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 31.05.2016 | ||
IE | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0137453 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | by applicant | WO0137453 |