EP1633446 - A trampoline [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/11] | A TRAMPOLINE | ||
[2013/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board & Batten International Inc. 4th Floor, Harbour Centre, North Church Street Georgetown / KY | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alexander, Keith Vivian 65 Middleton Road Upper Riccarton, Christchurch / NZ | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2006/11] | Brown, David Leslie HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04735534.2 | 31.05.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004NZ00111 | Priority number, date | NZ20030526211 | 30.05.2003 Original published format: NZ 52621103 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004105885 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1633446 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633446 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63B5/11 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
A63B5/11 (EP);
A63B71/0054 (EP);
A63B2071/0063 (EP);
A63B21/026 (EP);
A63B2209/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/36] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Trampolin | [2013/45] | English: | A trampoline | [2013/45] | French: | Trampoline | [2013/45] |
Former [2006/11] | TRAMPOLIN | ||
Former [2006/11] | A TRAMPOLINE | ||
Former [2006/11] | TRAMPOLINE | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 29.07.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 07.09.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6319174 (ALEXANDER KEITH VIVIAN [NZ]); | [A]WO03043704 (CANTERPRISE LTD [NZ], et al) |