EP1755474 - OSTEOSYNTHESIS PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWER, Stefan Talweg 44 79540 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
MARIÉTHOZ, Eric Les Cleves CH-1997 Haute-Nendaz / CH | 03 /
ANDERMATT, Daniel Bahnhofstrasse 93b CH-4313 Möhlin / CH | 04 /
MARTINELLI, Orlando Finkenweg 2 CH-3380 Wangen an der Aare / CH | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
SCHWER, Stefan Talweg 44 79540 Lörrach / DE | ||
02 /
MARI THOZ, Eric Les Cleves CH-1997 Haute-Nendaz / CH | |||
03 /
ANDERMATT, Daniel Bahnhofstrasse 93b CH-4313 Möhlin / CH | |||
04 /
MARTINELLI, Orlando Finkenweg 2 CH-3380 Wangen an der Aare / CH | |||
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
SCHWER, Stefan Talweg 44 79540 Lörrach / DE | ||
02 /
MARI THOZ, Eric Les Cleves CH-1997 Haute-Nendaz / CH | |||
03 /
ANDERMATT, Daniel Bahnhofstrasse 93b CH-4313 Möhlin / CH | |||
04 /
MARTINELLI, Orlando Felsenweg 11 CH-4536 Attiswil / CH | Representative(s) | Rosenich, Paul PPR AG Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Rosenich, Paul Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | Application number, filing date | 04735613.4 | 01.06.2004 | [2007/09] | WO2004IB01784 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117732 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755474 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755474 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/80 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/8061 (EP,US);
A61B17/58 (KR);
A61B17/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OSTEOSYNTHESEPLATTE | [2007/09] | English: | OSTEOSYNTHESIS PLATE | [2007/09] | French: | PLAQUE D'OSTEOSYNTHESE | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 24.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | LU | 01.06.2009 | BE | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
LU | 01.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4297993 (HAERLE ANTON) [X] 1,2,4,7 * figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 20 - line 38 *; | [X]US5785712 (RUNCIMAN ROBERT JOHN [CA], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9851226 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 6,7,20 * * page 23, line 33 - page 24, line 14 * * page 17, line 27 - page 19, line 11 *; | [E]EP1486175 (MUECKTER HELMUT DR MED DIPL-IN [DE], et al) [E] 1-8 * figures 1-5,9 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0046] *; | [I] - HEARN, E.J., Mechanics of Materials, Volume 2 - The Mechanics of Elastic and Plastic Deformation of Solids and Structural Materials (3rd Edition), AMSTERDAM NL, ELSEVIER, (1997), ISBN 0-7506-3266-6, XP002315178 [I] 1-9 * page 410, paragraph 1 * * page 414, paragraph 2 * * page 429, paragraph 10.3.7.C - page 430 * * page 431, paragraph 10.3.7.E - paragraph 10.3.7.F * * page 434, paragraph 10.3.9. - page 435 * * figures 10.16,10.17,10.24,10.44,10.46 * | [X] - PILKEY, WALTER D., Peterson's Stress Concentration Factors (2nd Edition), NEW YORK, USA, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1997), ISBN 0-471-53849-3, XP002315179 [X] 1-9 * page 225, paragraph 4 - paragraph 6 * * page 239, line 8 - line 9 * * page 240, paragraph 4.6.4. - page 241, paragraph 4.6.5. * * figures 4.30,4.79-4.84 * | [A] - SYNTHES USA, 3.5mm LCP Proximal Humerus Plate, U.S.A., SYNTHES USA, (200312), XP002315180 [A] 1,9 * pages 1,5,8,9 * |