EP1633798 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PREPARING HIGHLY PURE POLYALKYLENE GLYCOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/11] | HIGHLY PURE POLYALKYLENE GLYCOLS AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2006/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLUMPE, Markus Deidesheimer Str. 36 68309 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
BALDENIUS, Kai-Uwe Blumenstr. 41 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
HACKMANN, Claus Oberer Waldweg 19a 67281 Kirchheim a. d. Weinstrasse / DE | 04 /
LAUTERBACH, Arnulf Innsbrucker Weg 7 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
SEELMANN-EGGEBERT, Hans-Peter Weinbietstr. 2 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 06 /
ZIPPLIES, Matthias Eichstr. 36 67056 Neustadt/Weinstrasse / DE | [2006/15] |
Former [2006/11] | 01 /
KLUMPE, Markus Deidesheimer Str. 36 68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
02 /
BALDENIUS, Kai-Uwe Sperlinggasse 1 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03 /
HACKMANN, Claus Oberer Waldweg 19a 67281 Kirchheim a. d. Weinstrasse / DE | |||
04 /
LAUTERBACH, Arnulf Innsbrucker Weg 7 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
05 /
SEELMANN-EGGEBERT, Hans-Peter Weinbietstr. 2 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | |||
06 /
ZIPPLIES, Matthias Eichstr. 36 67056 Neustadt/Weinstrasse / DE | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04735738.9 | 02.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004EP05927 | Priority number, date | DE20031025264 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325264 | DE20031039184 | 26.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339184 | [2006/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004106407 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633798 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633798 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/30 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
C08G65/30 (EP,US);
C08G65/2609 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOCHREINER POLYALKYLENGLYKOLE | [2006/28] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PREPARING HIGHLY PURE POLYALKYLENE GLYCOLS | [2006/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYALKYLENEGLYCOLS A HAUT DEGRE DE PURETE | [2006/28] |
Former [2006/11] | HOCHREINE POLYALKYLENGLYKOLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2006/11] | HIGHLY PURE POLYALKYLENE GLYCOLS AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2006/11] | POLYALKYLENEGLYCOLS A HAUT DEGRE DE PURETE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CES COMPOSES | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.01.2007 | CZ | 03.01.2007 | DK | 03.01.2007 | EE | 03.01.2007 | FI | 03.01.2007 | IE | 03.01.2007 | PL | 03.01.2007 | RO | 03.01.2007 | SI | 03.01.2007 | SK | 03.01.2007 | TR | 03.01.2007 | BG | 03.04.2007 | GR | 04.04.2007 | LU | 02.06.2007 | PT | 04.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | HU | 04.07.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 03.01.2007 | |
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
LU | 02.06.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
HU | 04.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 03.01.2007 | |
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 03.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 03.01.2007 | |
PL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0400554 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-12* Beispiele 1-4 zusammen mit Seite 3 Zeilen 23-45 *; | [X]US5235114 (REISCH JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [X]RO114124 (IONESCU GEORGETA [RO], et al) [X] 1-12 * examples 2-4; claim 1 * * vgl. Anmeldung Seite 6 Zeilen 12-19 (Einsatz von saurem Ionentauscher, pH > 7) *; | [X]EP1245608 (NOF CORP [JP]) [X] 11 * Beispiele 1-5 zusammen mit Seite 4 Zeilen 23-33; Seite 9 Zeile 42-44 (United States Pharmacopeia, vgl. Anmeldung Seite 3 Zeilen 20-22)) * |