EP1647122 - SETTING OF DECISION THRESHOLDS IN A QAM RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALM, Peter Annehemsvägen 37 S-226 48 Lund / SE | 02 /
LINDOFF, Bengt Morkullevägen 45 S-237 36 Bjärred / SE | 03 /
CEDERGREN, Andreas Lagerbrings Väg 8A S-224 60 Lund / SE | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Akerman, Mårten Lennart, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Lund 221 83 Lund / SE | [2013/10] |
Former [2007/44] | Andersson, Björn E., et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Asketorp, Göran Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 04735876.7 | 03.06.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004EP05987 | Priority number, date | US20030609917 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 609917 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005004430 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647122 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647122 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/06, H04L27/38 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
H04L25/061 (EP,US);
H04L27/34 (KR);
H04L27/38 (KR);
H04L27/3809 (EP,US);
H04B2201/709727 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/16] | H04L27/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | EINSTELLUNG VON ENTSCHEIDUNGSSCHWELLWERTEN IN EINEM QAM-EMPFÄNGER | [2006/16] | English: | SETTING OF DECISION THRESHOLDS IN A QAM RECEIVER | [2006/16] | French: | ETABLISSEMENT DE SEUILS DE DECISION DANS UN RECEPTEUR EN QUADRATURE MULTINIVEAU | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12154701.2 / EP2453626 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2004 | AT | 13.03.2013 | BE | 13.03.2013 | CY | 13.03.2013 | CZ | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | RO | 13.03.2013 | SE | 13.03.2013 | SI | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | TR | 13.03.2013 | IE | 03.06.2013 | LU | 03.06.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | ES | 24.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | FR | 01.07.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.06.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.06.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.06.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SE | 13.03.2013 | |
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | SE | 13.03.2013 | |
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 13.03.2013 | |
BG | 13.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0887976 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 23 *; | [XP]US2004066861 (SONG YUN-JEONG [KR], et al) [XP] 1-30 * figure 3 *; | [XP]EP1420558 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [XP] 1-30 * paragraph [0021] *; | [E]WO2004054194 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [E] 1-30* figure 3 *; | [AD] - "A Method for blind determination of pilot to data power ratio for QAM signals", TSG-RAN WORKING GROUP 1 #21, Turin, IT, (200108), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.quintillion.co.jp/3GPP/TSG-RAN/RSG-RAN-WG1-RL1-09.html, (20040303), XP002272534 [AD] 1-30 * the whole document * | [A] - NAKHJIRI, SVENSSON, "Decision directed coherent detection of 16-QAM on fading channels", IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, New York, US, (19960428), pages 988 - 992, XP010162537 [A] 1-30 * section IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1996.501459 | [A] - BERNARDINI, DE FINA, "Optimal decision boundaries for M-QAM signal formats using neural classifiers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, Milan, IT, (199803), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 241 - 246, XP002272535 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/72.661119 |