EP1651967 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING AN OUTPUT SIGNAL, AND ROTATIONAL SPEED MEASUREMENT DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH A CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/30] |
Former [2006/50] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/18] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHHOLD, Reinhard Philips Intelct. Prop.&Stndrds GmbH Weisshausstr.2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP&L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/18] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04735955.9 | 03.06.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004IB50833 | Priority number, date | EP20030101786 | 18.06.2003 Original published format: EP 03101786 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004111658 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651967 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651967 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/489, G01P3/48, G01P3/481, G01D5/244, H03K5/007 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
G01P3/4802 (EP,US);
G01P3/481 (EP,US);
G01P3/489 (EP,US);
H03K5/007 (EP,US);
H03K5/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG EINES AUSGANGSSIGNALS, SOWIE MIT EINER DERARTIGEN SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG AUSGESTATTETE DREHZAHLMESSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/18] | English: | CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING AN OUTPUT SIGNAL, AND ROTATIONAL SPEED MEASUREMENT DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH A CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT | [2006/18] | French: | ARRANGEMENT DE CIRCUITS POUR PRODUIRE UN SIGNAL DE SORTIE, ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE VITESSE DE ROTATION COMPRENANT LEDIT ARRANGEMENT DE CIRCUITS | [2007/18] |
Former [2006/18] | PROCEDE DE MONTAGE DE CIRCUITS POUR PRODUIRE UN SIGNAL DE SORTIE, ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE VITESSE DE ROTATION COMPRENANT LEDIT MONTAGE DE CIRCUITS | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 29.10.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 29.10.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2007 | BE | 12.12.2007 | CH | 12.12.2007 | CY | 12.12.2007 | CZ | 12.12.2007 | DK | 12.12.2007 | EE | 12.12.2007 | FI | 12.12.2007 | LI | 12.12.2007 | NL | 12.12.2007 | PL | 12.12.2007 | RO | 12.12.2007 | SI | 12.12.2007 | SK | 12.12.2007 | TR | 12.12.2007 | BG | 12.03.2008 | SE | 12.03.2008 | GR | 13.03.2008 | ES | 23.03.2008 | PT | 12.05.2008 | IE | 03.06.2008 | LU | 03.06.2008 | HU | 13.06.2008 | IT | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2013/46] |
Former [2011/13] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
TR | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
GB | 03.06.2008 | ||
IE | 03.06.2008 | ||
LU | 03.06.2008 | ||
HU | 13.06.2008 | ||
IT | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
TR | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
GB | 03.06.2008 | ||
IE | 03.06.2008 | ||
LU | 03.06.2008 | ||
HU | 13.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
GB | 03.06.2008 | ||
IE | 03.06.2008 | ||
LU | 03.06.2008 | ||
HU | 13.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
GB | 03.06.2008 | ||
IE | 03.06.2008 | ||
LU | 03.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
GB | 03.06.2008 | ||
IE | 03.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
GB | 03.06.2008 | ||
IE | 03.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
IE | 03.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3808543 (MUELLER A) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 46 - line 63; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4359688 (HAVILLE GEORGE D) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 16 ** column 5, line 7 - line 12; figure . * |