EP1631873 - METHOD FOR GENERATING AND VERIFYING AN ORIGINALITY CHARACTERISTIC OF A DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states xyzmo Software GmbH Haiderstrasse 23 4052 Ansfelden / AT | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states Trodat GmbH Linzer Strasse 156 4600 Wels / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEBERER-KEFER, Walter Timesberger Strasse 21 A-4060 Leonding / AT | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Secklehner, Günter Rechtsanwalt Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Secklehner, Günter Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 04736368.4 | 09.06.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004AT00198 | Priority number, date | AT20030000895 | 10.06.2003 Original published format: AT 8952003 | [2006/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109479 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631873 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, H04N1/32, G07D7/00 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06F21/6209 (EP);
G06F21/64 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/40145 (EP);
G07D7/004 (EP);
H04N1/32144 (EP);
H04N2201/3235 (EP);
H04N2201/3236 (EP);
H04N2201/3271 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GENERIERUNG SOWIE VERIFIZIERUNG EINES ORIGINALITÄTSMERKMALS EINES DOKUMENTS | [2006/10] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING AND VERIFYING AN ORIGINALITY CHARACTERISTIC OF A DOCUMENT | [2006/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET DE VERIFICATION D'UNE CARACTERISTIQUE D'AUTHENTICITE D'UN DOCUMENT | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 05.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/30] | 03.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9957623 (FRAUNHOFER CENTER FOR RESEARCH) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * page 11, line 26 - line 27 * * figure 1 * * page 16, line 9 - line 10 * * page 11, line 17 - line 27 * * page 13, line 13 - line 27 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US6487301 (ZHAO JIAN) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraph [0113] *; | [A]EP1286315 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1-9 * |