EP1665538 - LOW-DENSITY PARITY-CHECK CODES FOR MULTIPLE CODE RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLPMAN, Victor, J. 18330 Gallery Drive, Apt. A231 Dallas, TX 75252 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Brax, Matti Juhani, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Brax, Matti Juhani, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2006/23] | Brax, Matti Juhani Berggren OY AB Lentokatu 2 90460 Oulunsalo / FI | Application number, filing date | 04736427.8 | 09.06.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004IB01886 | Priority number, date | US20030608943 | 26.06.2003 Original published format: US 608943 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004114526 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1665538 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/11 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
H03M13/1102 (EP,US);
H03M13/11 (KR);
H03M13/033 (EP,US);
H03M13/35 (KR);
H03M13/6362 (EP,US);
H03M13/6393 (EP,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0051 (EP,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | H03M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARITÄTSPRÜFCODES GERINGER DICHTE FÜR MEHRERE CODERATEN | [2006/23] | English: | LOW-DENSITY PARITY-CHECK CODES FOR MULTIPLE CODE RATES | [2006/23] | French: | CODES DE CONTROLE DE PARITE A FAIBLE DENSITE POUR DES VITESSES DE CODAGE MULTIPLES | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 09.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0147124 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-14,21-26* abstract *; | [X] - LI J AND NARAYANAN K. R., "Rate-compatible low density parity check codes for capacity-approaching ARQ schemes in packet data communications", PROC., THE IASTED INTERNAT. CONF. ON COMMUNICATIONS, INTERNET AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, (20021118), pages 201 - 206, XP002339009 [X] 1-5,7,9-14,21,22,24,25 * page 202, column R - page 204, column R * * page 206; figure 6 * | [DX] - JEONGSEOK HA ET AL, "Optimal puncturing of irregular low-density parity-check codes", PROC., IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, ICC 2003, ANCHORAGE, AK, (20030511), vol. 5, ISBN 978-0-7803-7802-5, pages 3110 - 3114, XP010643019 [DX] 1-5,7-14,21,22,24,25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2003.1203992 | [X] - HAGENAUER J, "Rate-compatible punctured convolutional codes (RCPC codes) and their applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19880401), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 389 - 400, XP000670428 [X] 1-5,7,12 * figures 1,4; tables I,II * * page 390 - page 391 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.2763 | [X] - ECHARD R. ET AL., "Irregular "pi"-rotation LDPC codes", PROC., IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, GLOBECOM 2002, TAIPEI, TAIWAN, (20021117), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7632-8, pages 1274 - 1278, XP010636350 [X] 1-5,7,9-14,21,22,24,25 * page 1277, column R - page 1278, column L; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2002.1188402 | [A] - KALLEL S, "Complementary punctured convolutional (CPC) codes and their applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19950601), vol. 43, no. 6, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 2005 - 2009, XP000510831 [A] 6,23,26 * page 2006 - page 2007 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.387438 | International search | [AP]US6633856 (RICHARDSON TOM [US], et al); | [A]US2002101915 (ZHANG SONG [CA], et al) | [X] - COX ET AL., "Subband Speech Coding and Matched Convolutional Channel Coding for Mobile Radio Channels.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING., (199108), vol. 39, no. 8, pages 1717 - 1731, XP000260894 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.91143 | [X] - KIM ET AL., "Rate Compatible Punctured SCCC.", IEEE 54TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE., (200110), pages 2399 - 2403, XP010562401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTC.2001.957179 |