EP1639859 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LOCATING A ROOM AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISER, Thomas Triester Strasse 64 A-1101 Vienna / AT | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/13] | Röggla, Harald Philips Austria GmbH, Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Triesterstrasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 04736439.3 | 09.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004IB50878 | Priority number, date | EP20030101758 | 16.06.2003 Original published format: EP 03101758 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004112432 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1639859 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04S3/00 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
G01S5/16 (EP,US);
H04R3/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR RAUMORTUNG | [2006/13] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LOCATING A ROOM AREA | [2006/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LOCALISER UNE ZONE D'ECOUTE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3536924 (SOBERMAN ROBERT K) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XY]US4295740 (STURGES JR ROBERT H) [X] 1-7,12-17 * figures 1-8 * * column 3, line 20 - line 21 * * column 1, line 5 - line 6 * * column 2, line 34 - line 37 * [Y] 8,9; | [A]DE4101156 (AUDIOCINEMA ELECTRONIC UND MED [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 15 - line 39 * * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5255326 (STEVENSON ALDEN [US]) [A] 8 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 48 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5386478 (PLUNKETT BRADLEY J [US]) [A] 8 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 6 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US6118880 (KOKKOSOULIS GEORGE [US], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 12 * * column 1, line 59 - line 65 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0188470 (UNISENSOR APS [DK], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 2 * * page 1, line 2 - line 3 * * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 33 *; | [A]US2002136414 (JORDAN RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 8 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0008] *; | [YA]US2003031333 (COHEN YUVAL [IL], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * figures 11,12 * [A] 8; | [A]US2003043051 (SHIRAISHI TADASHI [JP]) [A] 8 * figure 2 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0019] * | Examination | AT333866B | GB2186367 |