EP1640614 - ROTARY FLUID MACHINERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURITA, Shin Rinkai Factory, Sakai Plant, Daikin Ind 12, Chikkoushinmachi 3-cho, Shakai.shi Osaka 592-8331 / JP | 02 /
UENO, Hiromichi Yodogawa Plant, Daikin Ind.Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Goddar, Heinz J. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04736594.5 | 10.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004JP08512 | Priority number, date | JP20030165131 | 10.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003165131 | [2006/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109113 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640614 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/32, F04C18/356 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
F04C18/3562 (EP,US);
F04C18/322 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F04C29/12 (EP,US);
F04C23/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTATIONSSTRÖMUNGSMASCHINE | [2006/13] | English: | ROTARY FLUID MACHINERY | [2006/13] | French: | MACHINE HYDRAULIQUE ROTATIVE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2005 | Translation filed | 08.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS57176686U (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) [Y] 4 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH01134092 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [X]JPH08165995 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2000087888 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 4 * abstract * * figures 1-14 *; | [XYI]JP2000234592 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 6-9 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * [Y] 4 [I] 2,3; | [A]JP2001099083 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 3 * abstract ** figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPS57176686U ; | [X]JPH08165995 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION); | [Y]JP2000087888 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH01134092 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001099083 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |