EP1635955 - WATER DISTRIBUTION AND VAPORIZATION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ditta Edoardo Lossa S.p.A. Via E. De Nicola 26 20090 Cesano Boscone (MI) / IT | [2011/51] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Edoardo Lossa S.p.A. Via E. De Nicola 26 20090 Cesano Boscone, Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEVILACQUA, Leopoldo Brunaustrasse 17 CH-8002 Zurich / CH | 02 /
GASPARETTO, Roberto Via Russoli 7 I-20142 Milan / IT | 03 /
DI RIENZO, Aldo Via Duccio da Boninsegna 3/B I-20094 Assago, Milan / IT | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Martegani, Franco, et al Via Carlo Alberto, 41 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | [2011/20] |
Former [2011/10] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/33] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/41] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/12] | Coppo, Alessandro, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A., Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04736933.5 | 16.06.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004IB02044 | Priority number, date | IT2003MI01244 | 19.06.2003 Original published format: IT MI20031244 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004110639 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1635955 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1635955 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1635955 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/20, B05B15/06, F02C3/30 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
F02C3/30 (EP,KR,US);
B05B1/14 (KR);
B05B1/20 (EP,KR,US);
F16L41/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Title | German: | WASSERVERTEILUNGS- UND -VERDAMPFUNGSANORDNUNG | [2006/12] | English: | WATER DISTRIBUTION AND VAPORIZATION ASSEMBLY | [2006/12] | French: | INSTALLATION DE DISTRIBUTION ET VAPORISATION D'EAU | [2011/22] |
Former [2006/12] | INSTALLATION DE DISTRIBUTION D'EAU DE VAPORISATION | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 13.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 21.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2007 | 30.06.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.03.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2004 | AT | 30.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | PL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | IE | 16.06.2012 | LU | 16.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 16.06.2012 | ||
LU | 16.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 16.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 16.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB493451 (DEWANDRE CO LTD C, et al) [A] 7,9-12,15 * column W *; | [Y]US2605140 (BARTLING LOREN E) [Y] 1-4,7,8,10-12,15 * column 1, line 1 - line 5; figure - * * column 2, line 1 - line 22 *; | [YA]FR2539056 (DEBRECENI MEZOEGAZDASAGI [HU]) [Y] 1,16 * column A * * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 35; figure 1 * [A] 7-12,15; | [A]FR2540405 (HOLDER GMBH CO GEBR [DE]) [A] 7-11,15,16 * page 5, line 13 - line 28; figure 2 *; | [A]US2001003312 (SPIEGEL RICHARD V [US]) [A] 1,2,5,9,10,12,15,16 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1108870 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,4,7,8 * column A; figures 1,3-5 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0116] *; | [A]US2002100819 (TAYLOR ROBIN A J [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,7 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1,5 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0053] ** paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0085] *; | [Y]GB2382847 (ALSTOM [CH]) [Y] 1-4,7,8,10-12,15,16 * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 25; figure 5 * |