Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006157887 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT4502003 | 27.06.2003 | WO2004AT00221 | 24.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1651420 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2008 | B1 | EP1651420 | 03.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT4502003 | 27.06.2003 | WO2004AT00221 | 24.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE406992T | 15.09.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AT4502003 | 27.06.2003 | WO2004AT00221 | 24.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502004007996D1 | 16.10.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AT4502003 | 27.06.2003 | WO2004AT00221 | 24.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005000557 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT4502003 | 27.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT6791U | 26.04.2004 | U1 | Priority number | Date | AT4502003 | 27.06.2003 |