Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1661038
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.04.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
21.12.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.07.2010 |
First examination report |
|
06.07.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.04.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
09.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
18.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
19.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.04.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
14.04.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
08.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|