Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7987203 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2011 | B2 | US2006287977 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004AU01013 | 30.07.2004 | AU2003904117 | 06.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004263907B | Global Dossier | 19.11.2009 | B2 | AU2004263907 | 05.11.2009 | A8 | AU2004263907 | 17.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004AU01013 | 30.07.2004 | AU2004263907 | 30.07.2004 | AU2003904117 | 06.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1661038 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2010 | A4 | EP1661038 | 31.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004AU01013 | 30.07.2004 | AU2003904117 | 06.08.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005015430 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2003904117 | 06.08.2003 |