EP1651151 - ORIENTATION DEVICE FOR SURGICAL IMPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states San-Tech Surgical Sàrl Avenue de Milan, 14 1007 Lausanne / CH | [2012/18] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Echeverri, Santiago Avenue de Milan 14 1007 Lausanne / CH | ||
For all designated states San-Tech Surgical Sàrl Avenue de Milan, 14 1007 Lausanne / CH | |||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Echeverri, Santiago Avenue de Milan 14 1007 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Echeverri, Santiago Avenue de Milan 14 1007 Lausanne / CH | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe, et al ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Grosfillier, Philippe, et al Andre Roland S.A. Intellectual Property Services Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2006/18] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Intellectual Property Services Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 04738106.6 | 23.07.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004CH00466 | Priority number, date | WO2003CH00502 | 24.07.2003 Original published format: PCT/CH0300/502 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005009303 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651151 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651151 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/1746 (EP,US);
A61F2/4657 (EP,US);
A61B2090/068 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/4609 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30538 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Title | German: | AUSRICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT | [2006/18] | English: | ORIENTATION DEVICE FOR SURGICAL IMPLEMENT | [2006/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ORIENTATION DESTINE A DES FINS CHIRURGICALES | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2004 | AT | 06.06.2012 | BE | 06.06.2012 | CY | 06.06.2012 | CZ | 06.06.2012 | DK | 06.06.2012 | EE | 06.06.2012 | FI | 06.06.2012 | IT | 06.06.2012 | NL | 06.06.2012 | PL | 06.06.2012 | RO | 06.06.2012 | SE | 06.06.2012 | SI | 06.06.2012 | SK | 06.06.2012 | TR | 06.06.2012 | IE | 23.07.2012 | LU | 23.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | BG | 06.09.2012 | GR | 07.09.2012 | ES | 17.09.2012 | PT | 08.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.07.2012 | ||
LU | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 06.06.2012 | |
SE | 06.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9729698 (ADVANCED TECHNICAL FABRICATION [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12 * page 6, line 26 - page 8, line 33 *; | [X]GB2224937 (FARMER MALCOLM HUGH, et al) [X] 1,5-7,10,11,14,16,22,24-28 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 4 - page 15, paragraph 3 *; | [XD]US6302890 (LEONE JR WILLIAM [US]) [XD] 1,8 * column 5, line 31 - column 7, line 27 *; | [X]US6395005 (LOVELL TIMOTHY PATRICK [US]) [X] 1,7,9,13,15,17-21,23,27,28 * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 65 * * column 9, line 8 - line 45 *; | [X]DE20006515U (GOBIT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * |