EP1620191 - DISTILLATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whitefox Technologies Limited Fifth Floor 15 Whitehall London SW1A 2DD / GB | [2014/32] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states 2S-Sophisticated Systems Limited 10 Cromwell Place South Kensington London SW7 2JN / GB | ||
For all designated states Buss-SMS-Canzler GmbH Kaiserstrasse 13-15 35510 Butzbach / DE | |||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states 2S-Sophisticated Systems Limited 10 Cromwell Place, South Kensington London SW7 2JN / GB | ||
For all designated states BUSS-SMS-Canzler GmbH Kaiserstrasse 13-15 35510 Butzbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUM, Stephan, Rüdiger 1414 Windsor St. NW Calgary, Alberta T2N 3X4 / CA | 02 /
KAISER, Bernhard Am Wenauer Hof 4 52399 Merzenich / DE | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson, et al Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Potter Clarkson LLP, et al The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2014/27] | Potter Clarkson LLP, et al The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2006/05] | Holland, Ralf, et al Eikel & Partner GbR Anwaltskanzlei Hünenweg 15 D-32760 Detmold / DE | Application number, filing date | 04738474.8 | 24.04.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004DE00867 | Priority number, date | DE20031019046 | 25.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10319046 | [2006/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004096403 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1620191 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1620191 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/14 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B01D61/14 (EP,US);
B01D3/146 (EP,US);
B01D63/16 (EP,US);
B01D65/08 (EP,US);
B01D2311/06 (EP,US);
B01D2311/08 (EP,US);
B01D2315/02 (EP,US);
B01D2321/2016 (EP,US);
Y10S159/27 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/06, B01D2311/2669 (EP,US);
B01D2311/08, B01D2311/2669 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DESTILLATIONSVERFAHREN | [2006/05] | English: | DISTILLATION METHOD | [2006/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE DISTILLATION | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/20] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 30.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/43] | 09.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.12.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2011 | 30.04.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   07.09.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2004 | BG | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | GR | 24.02.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | AT | 24.04.2017 | IE | 24.04.2017 | LU | 24.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.04.2004 | |
BG | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 24.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 24.04.2004 | |
BG | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 24.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.04.2004 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 24.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 24.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 23.11.2016 | |
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4302030 (INST UMWELTTECHNOLOGIE UND UMW [DE]) [X] 1,2,11,17 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004000473 (HOFEN WILLI [DE], et al) [PX] 1,2,11 * column A; figures 1,4,5 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] *; | [X]DE4137572 (DEINHARD & CO) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 60 *; | [A]US5143526 (LEE ERIC K [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column A; figures 7,9,13,15,17 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 22 * * column 23, line 1 - line 10 * * column 26, line 10 - line 17 * * column 27, line 64 - column 28, line 15 * * column 29, line 51 - line 64 *; | [A]US5480665 (SMITH CLARK R [US]) [A] 1-19 * column A; figure 3 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 52 *; | [A]FR2743069 (PROCEDES ET SERVICES PROSER [FR]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0110540 (MICROFILTRATION TECHNOLOGY APS [DK], et al) [A] 3 * page 3, line 15 - line 26 * | by applicant | DE4302030 | DE4137572 |