EP1641614 - CAGE BAR COMPRISING A SPACER, AND PRESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harburg-Freudenberger Maschinenbau GmbH Seevestrasse 1 21079 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Harburg-Freundenberger Maschinenbau GmbH Seevestrasse 1 21079 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VORREAU, Lothar Fossholt 3 21079 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
VOSS, Günter Mühlenstrasse 10 21357 Bardowick / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Klickow, Hans-Henning Klickow & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Jessenstrasse 4 DE-22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Klickow, Hans-Henning Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Klickow, Hans-Henning Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04738676.8 | 14.06.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004DE01224 | Priority number, date | DE2003129952 | 03.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10329952 | [2006/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005007393 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1641614 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B30B9/26 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
B30B9/267 (EP,US);
B30B9/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEIHERSTAB MIT DISTANZELEMENT SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABPRESSEN | [2006/14] | English: | CAGE BAR COMPRISING A SPACER, AND PRESSING DEVICE | [2006/14] | French: | BARRE DE FILTRE A TAMIS COMPRENANT UN ELEMENT D'ECARTEMENT ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION PAR PRESSION | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/41] | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR703870 (H. M. LAMY-TORRILHON) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 93 - line 104; compounds 7,8 *; | [DA]US3126820 (C. B. UPTON) [DA] 1,10 * figure - *; | [A]GB1182470 (ROSE DOWNS & THOMPSON LTD) [A] 1,9-11 * page 1, line 83 - line 87; figure - *; | [A]FR2029032 (ROSE DOWNS & THOMPSON LTD) [A] 1,9-11 * page 4, line 17 - line 19; figure - *; | [A]GB2292111 (SMET ROSEDOWNS LIMITED DE [GB]) [A] 1,7,10,11 * page 5, line 9 - line 10; figure - *; | [YD]EP0956942 (HASENBEIN GUENTER DIPL ING [DE]) [YD] 1-11 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [YD]EP1240997 (HASENBEIN GUENTER DIPL-ING [DE]) [YD] 1-11 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 29 - line 34; figure . *; | [PA]WO03076173 (THYSSENKRUPP ELASTOMERTECHNIK [DE], et al) [PA] 1,10* claims 1,3,4,8,10,12,13,18,20,21 * |