EP1658654 - BATTERY PACK COMPRISING HEAT-DIFFUSING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLAUNING, Rainer Froschegert 11 72631 Aichtal-Groetzingen / DE | 02 /
KELLER, Stephan Panoramastrasse 10 71088 Holzgerlingen / DE | 03 /
MATTHIAS, Wolf Burgenlandstrasse 75 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
REJMAN, Marcin Aspacher Strasse 74 71533 Backwang / DE | [2006/21] | Application number, filing date | 04738795.6 | 25.06.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004DE01348 | Priority number, date | DE2003138654 | 22.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10338654 | [2006/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005027241 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1658654 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/50 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
H01M10/4207 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/6235 (EP,US);
H01M10/643 (EP,US);
H01M10/6555 (EP,US);
H01M10/6557 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M10/6551 (EP,US);
H01M10/6561 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2006/29] |
Former [2006/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK MIT MITTELN ZUR WÄRMEABLEITUNG | [2006/21] | English: | BATTERY PACK COMPRISING HEAT-DIFFUSING MEANS | [2006/21] | French: | BATTERIE POURVUE DE MOYENS DE DISSIPATION DE CHALEUR | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 02.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/08] | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2638862 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,4 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [AD]EP0940864 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1035599 (TOSHIBA BATTERY [JP]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [X]US6566005 (SHIMMA YASUTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 58-65 * * column 8, lines 52-63 * * claims 1,6 * | Examination | US6004689 |