EP1651327 - A FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DMA SORPTION APS Skelstedet 5 2950 Vedbok / DK | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSEN, Ole Skovvej 77D DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 02 /
LARSEN, Lise, Nohr Ingebogvej 21 DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Hegner, Anette Hegner & Partners A/S Symbion Science Park Fruebjergvej 3 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Hegner, Anette Hegner & Partners A/S Banemarksvej 50 2605 Brøndby / DK | ||
Former [2006/18] | Hoeiberg, Susanne Hoeiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 04738971.3 | 02.07.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004DK00474 | Priority number, date | DK20030001002 | 02.07.2003 Original published format: DK 200301002 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005002704 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651327 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/24 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
B01D25/001 (EP,US);
B01D25/24 (EP,US);
B01D29/15 (EP,US);
B01D29/54 (EP,US);
B01D29/58 (EP,US);
B01D2201/291 (EP,US);
B01D2201/34 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN FILTER | [2006/18] | English: | A FILTER | [2006/18] | French: | FILTRE | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 15.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/39] | 22.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4271025 (ERDMANNSDOERFER HANS) [AD] 1-101,1-101,1-101 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]EP0306231 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-101,1-101,1-101 * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 27 * * figure -; example 2 * * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 27 * * figure -; example 2 * * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 27 * * figure -; example 2 *; | [AD]US6391200 (PULEK JOHN L [US], et al) [AD] 1-101,1-101,1-101 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * | Examination | WO0107142 |