EP1765137 - PICK-UP ABSORBENT TISSUE PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 176 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREDAHL, Gunnar Alzeyer Strasse 236 67549 Worms / DE | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04739433.3 | 28.05.2004 | [2007/13] | WO2004EP05790 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117681 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1765137 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1765137 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47L25/00, C09J7/04 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
A47L25/005 (EP);
A47L13/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFNAHME- UND SAUGFÄHIGES TISSUEPAPIER | [2007/13] | English: | PICK-UP ABSORBENT TISSUE PAPER | [2007/13] | French: | PAPIER MINCE ABSORBANT DE RAMASSAGE | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2004 | AT | 13.07.2011 | BE | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | CZ | 13.07.2011 | DK | 13.07.2011 | EE | 13.07.2011 | NL | 13.07.2011 | PL | 13.07.2011 | RO | 13.07.2011 | SI | 13.07.2011 | SK | 13.07.2011 | TR | 13.07.2011 | BG | 13.10.2011 | GR | 14.10.2011 | PT | 14.11.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
TR | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 13.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09140655 ; | [X]US2474619 (FARRELL ROBERT A, et al) [X] 1,4,8-10,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2838421 (SOHL WILLIAM E); | [X]US4990192 (PALLONE THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,12,15 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5198292 (LERNER PETER [US], et al) [DA] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 32, Database accession no. 1997-345161, XP002316697 & JPH09140655 A 19970603 (TCF KK) [A] 1,15 * abstract * | Examination | EP1239079 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, Weinheim, Wiley-VCH, (2003), vol. 25, page 125 |