EP1631490 - LIFTING AID FOR WATERCRAFTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl BGT Defence GmbH & Co. KG Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 13 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states Diehl BGT Defence GmbH & Co.KG Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 13 88662 Überlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLEICHER, Ulrich Breslauer Str. 20 91217 Hersbruck / DE | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04739553.8 | 03.06.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004EP05980 | Priority number, date | DE20031025695 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325695 | [2006/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004108520 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631490 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1631490 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B63B43/12, B63C7/12 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
B63B43/12 (EP);
B63C7/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2006/37] |
Former [2006/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFTRIEBSHILFE FÜR WASSERFAHRZEUGE | [2006/10] | English: | LIFTING AID FOR WATERCRAFTS | [2006/10] | French: | AIDE DE FLOTTAISON POUR DES BATEAUX | [2008/28] |
Former [2006/10] | AIDE LA FLOTTABILIT POUR DES BATEAUX | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4232417 (MILLER DONALD ET AL) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 6; figures 4,5 *; | [AD]EP0919460 (DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO) [AD] 1 * figure 4; claims 4,6 *; | [A]FR2271117 (FRANCE ETAT) [A] 1 * page 5, lines 18-36; figures 11,16 *; | [A]US4996936 (BRUNDRITT LARRY W) [A] 1,2 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4413583 (ELLING WILLIAM E ET AL) [A] 2 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE19747359 (SEIDEL RAINER) [A] 3 * page 3, columns 33-44; figure 3 * |