EP1633418 - DRIVE MECHANISM FOR ADVANCING AN ADVANCING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/11] | DRIVE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADVANCING AN ADVANCING ELEMENT | ||
[2011/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [2012/14] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Disetronic Licensing AG Kirchbergstrasse 190 3401 Burgdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINIGER, Hanspeter Hoefliweg 5 CH-4932 Lotzwil / CH | 02 /
JOST, Stefan Brunnweg 24 CH-3203 Mühleberg / CH | 03 /
SIEGENTHALER, Roger Lindenweg 3a CH-3110 Münsingen / CH | 04 /
WÜTHRICH, Heinz Worblaufenstrasse 142 CH-3048 Worblaufen / CH | [2006/16] |
Former [2006/11] | 01 /
HEINIGER, Hanspeter Hoefliweg 5 CH-4932 Lotzwil / CH | ||
02 /
JOST, Stefan Huehnerbuehl 47 CH-3065 Bolligen / CH | |||
03 /
SIEGENTHALER, Roger Mattackerstrasse 25 CH-3073 Gümligen / CH | |||
04 /
WÜTHRICH, Heinz Worblaufenstrasse 142 CH-3048 Worblaufen / CH | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Rentsch Partner AG Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2012/14] | Rentsch Partner AG Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2012/11] | Kälin, Moritz Andreas Rentsch & Partner AG Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/49] | Schalch, Rainer, et al c/o E. Blum & Co. Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/11] | Küng, Peter Disetronic Medical Systems AG Kirchbergstrasse 190 CH-3401 Burgdorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 04739731.0 | 09.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004EP06221 | Priority number, date | DE20031026766 | 13.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10326766 | [2006/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004110532 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633418 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633418 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/20 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
A61M5/484 (EP,US);
A61M5/2033 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2230/201 (EP,US);
A61M5/482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG ZUM VORSCHUB EINES VORSCHUBELEMENTS | [2011/48] | English: | DRIVE MECHANISM FOR ADVANCING AN ADVANCING ELEMENT | [2011/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR AVANCER UN ELEMENT DE DEPLACEMENT EN AVANT | [2011/48] |
Former [2006/11] | ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VORSCHUB EINES VORSCHUBELEMENTS | ||
Former [2006/11] | DRIVE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADVANCING AN ADVANCING ELEMENT | ||
Former [2006/11] | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE AVANCER UN ELEMENT DE DEPLACEMENT EN AVANT | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2004 | CY | 11.04.2012 | CZ | 11.04.2012 | EE | 11.04.2012 | FI | 11.04.2012 | IT | 11.04.2012 | PL | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SE | 11.04.2012 | SI | 11.04.2012 | SK | 11.04.2012 | TR | 11.04.2012 | AT | 09.06.2012 | IE | 09.06.2012 | LU | 09.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | GR | 12.07.2012 | ES | 22.07.2012 | PT | 13.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
AT | 09.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
AT | 09.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
AT | 09.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 11.04.2012 | |
SE | 11.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5244465 (MICHEL PETER [CH]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 50; figure - *; | [X]WO9413343 (HABLEY MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11 * page 5, line 12 - page 10, line 35; figure - *; | [A]WO9801171 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-12* page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 15; figure - *; | [X]EP0897728 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0026] - [0035]; figure - * |