EP1636872 - HF CONNECTION FOR JOINING AN HF COMPONENT TO AN ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [2007/31] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUNBERGER, Thomas Grenzlandstrasse 3a 83435 Bad Reichenhall / DE | 02 /
STOLLE, Manfred Rennbahnstrasse 9 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04739988.6 | 17.06.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004EP06529 | Priority number, date | DE2003128880 | 26.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10328880 | [2006/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005001987 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1636872 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1636872 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/04, H01P1/06, H01Q23/00 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
H01R24/42 (EP);
H01P1/045 (EP);
H01P1/065 (EP);
H01Q23/00 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R2201/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2006/40] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HF-VERBINDUNG FÜR EINE VERBINDUNG EINER HF-KOMPONENTE MIT EINER ANTENNE | [2006/12] | English: | HF CONNECTION FOR JOINING AN HF COMPONENT TO AN ANTENNA | [2006/12] | French: | CONNEXION HF POUR LA CONNEXION D'UN COMPOSANT HF ET D'UNE ANTENNE | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 14.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0814538 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [Y] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 47 * * figures 1-5 * * abstract *; | [X]DE2609076 (KERNFORSCHUNG GMBH GES FUER) [X] 4,6-16,20-28 * page 5, line 1 - line 25 * * page 7, line 1 - line 27 * * figure 2 *; | [X]JP2002353702 ; | [A]JPS6172401 ; | [A]DE1591559 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 4,6-9,11-13,15-24,26 * page 6, line 21 - page 9, line 7 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9708776 (HAZELTINE CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 11, line 22 - page 15, line 1 * * figures 8a-10 * * abstract *; | [A]US6388622 (JENNETTI ANTHONY G [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 19 * * figure 1 * * abstract * | [XY] - KHATTAB T ET AL, "PRINCIPLES OF LOW PIM HARDWARE DESIGN", NATIONAL RADIO SCIENCE CONFERENCE, CAIRO, EGYPT, (19960319), pages 1 - 8, XP000985572 [X] 4,6-28 * the whole document * [Y] 1-3,5 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030402), vol. 2003, no. 04, & JP2002353702 A 20021206 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 4,6-28 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860819), vol. 0102, no. 40, Database accession no. (E - 429), & JP61072401 A 19860414 (NEC CORP) [A] 4,6-13 * abstract * |