24.08.2018 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
07.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
07.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
09.08.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
04.08.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
09.07.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
10.03.2017 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
20.02.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
11.11.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
29.06.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
23.02.2016 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
23.02.2016 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
09.04.2013 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
22.01.2013 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
22.01.2013 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
22.01.2013 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
22.01.2013 |
Deletion: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
22.01.2013 |
Deletion: Appeal number |
|
18.01.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
28.11.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
12.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
23.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
24.07.2009 |
New entry: Reply by parties involved to observations of proprietor |
|
24.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
03.07.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of observations of proprietor to parties involved + time limit |
|
03.07.2009 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
19.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
22.04.2009 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
09.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
16.12.2008 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
21.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
21.11.2008 |
Opposition filed |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
12.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
26.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
19.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
11.01.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
22.12.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.12.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.08.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
31.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
10.02.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
31.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|