Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8240501 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2012 | B2 | US2006151503 | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP06723 | 22.06.2004 | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4879736B | Global Dossier | 22.02.2012 | B2 | JP2009513443 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP06723 | 22.06.2004 | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004255572B | Global Dossier | 19.05.2011 | B8 | AU2004255572B | 14.04.2011 | B2 | AU2004255572 | 03.09.2009 | A8 | AU2004255572 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP06723 | 22.06.2004 | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1638860 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2008 | B1 | EP1638860 | 29.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP06723 | 22.06.2004 | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | EP04740152 | 22.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0412017 | 26.04.2016 | B1 | BRPI0412017 | 15.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP06723 | 22.06.2004 | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2531006 | 03.04.2012 | C | CA2531006 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP06723 | 22.06.2004 | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004011766D1 | 27.03.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP06723 | 22.06.2004 | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05014044 | 17.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP06723 | 22.06.2004 | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005005277 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2006 | A8 | WO2005005277 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100984710B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2010 | B1 | KR20060026455 | 23.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE385969T | 15.03.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100480149C | 22.04.2009 | C | CN1816482 | 09.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2297435T | 01.05.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL207509B | 31.12.2010 | B1 | PL379071 | 26.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR200505043T | 21.01.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200510191 | 27.12.2006 | B | Priority number | Date | EP03254287 | 01.07.2003 |