EP1638860 - CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Opposition rejected | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crown Packaging Technology Inc 11535 S. Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAYDON, Paul, Charles 35 Elizabeth Drive Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 9YA / GB | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/13] | Ratliff, Ismay Hilary CROWN Packaging UK plc, Downsview Road Wantage Oxon, OX12 9BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04740152.6 | 22.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004EP06723 | Priority number, date | EP20030254287 | 01.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03254287 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005005277 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1638860 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1638860 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D79/00, B65D17/50 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
B65D17/502 (EP,KR,US);
B65D1/14 (KR);
B65D79/008 (EP,KR,US);
B65D79/0081 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSS | [2006/13] | English: | CLOSURE | [2006/13] | French: | BOUCHON | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 24.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2017
10.12.2008
ADMISSIBLE Ardagh MP Group Netherlands B.V. Zutphenseweg 51 7418 AH Deventer / NL Opponent's representative Leonhard, Frank Reimund, et al, et al Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [2017/15] |
Former [2008/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2008
IMPRESS Group B.V. Zutphenseweg 51051 7400 AP Deventer / NL Opponent's representative Leonhard, Frank Reimund, et al, et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | 19.12.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.06.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.07.2009 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 20.07.2009 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 30.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.01.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/39] | 22.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.05.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 11.01.2013 | Appeal received No. T0149/13 | 08.04.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.02.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2008 | BE | 13.02.2008 | CY | 13.02.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | PL | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | DE | 14.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | LU | 22.06.2008 | IE | 23.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
DE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LU | 22.06.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
DE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LU | 22.06.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
DE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LU | 22.06.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
DE | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
DE | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
DE | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
DE | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
DE | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB454429 (ROMAN BLACE BUKOLT) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 58 - page 2, line 75; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3160302 (CHAPLIN GEORGE F) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5804237 (DIAMOND GEORGE B [US], et al) [A] 1-8* column 4, line 12 - column 7, line 4; figures 2B,2C,2D *; | [A]WO03006329 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 27, line 1 - page 29, line 3; figures 2A,2B,3,4,13 * |