EP1639337 - DOLLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICO GESELLSCHAFT FüR MIKROELEKTRONIK mbH Dieselstrasse 15 D-87437 Kempten / DE | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
HINN, Albert, K. Im Hölzle 1 73061 Ebersbach / DE | Representative(s) | Vonnemann, Gerhard, et al Vonnemann, Kloiber & Kollegen Edisonstrasse 2 87437 Kempten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Vonnemann, Gerhard, et al Vonnemann, Kloiber & Kollegen Edisonstrasse 2 87437 Kempten / DE | Application number, filing date | 04740201.1 | 23.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004EP06780 | Priority number, date | DE2003209864U | 25.06.2003 Original published format: DE 20309864 U | [2006/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004113861 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1639337 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639337 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/00, G01M3/38, F16L55/26 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
G01M3/38 (EP,US);
G01M3/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERAWAGEN | [2006/13] | English: | DOLLY | [2006/13] | French: | CHARIOT POUR APPAREIL DE PRISE DE VUE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 13.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | GR | 18.11.2009 | IE | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | ES | 28.02.2010 | PT | 18.03.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | LU | 23.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
TR | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
LU | 23.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
LU | 23.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 28.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4017238 (GGU GES FUER GEO PHYSIKALISCHE [DE]) [Y] 16* column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 2 *; | [YD]DE4206609 (OPTOELEKTRONISCHE INSPEKTIONS [DE]) [YD] 8 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 19 *; | [YD]EP0623814 (RICO MIKROELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-8,13 * the whole document *; | [XY]GB2342419 (PEARPOINT LTD [GB]) [X] 9-12,14,15,17 * page 2; figures 1,2 * * page 3 * [Y] 13,16; | [YD]EP1022553 (HUNGER IBAK H GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 1-7 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009]; figure 1 * |