EP1776797 - PACKET-BASED DATA PROCESSING TECHNIQUE, TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/17] | PACKET-BASED DATA PROCESSING TECHNIQUE AND TRANSMISSION | ||
[2009/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKVALL, Stefan Sigtunagatan 18 S-113 22 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
WIBERG, Niclas Sofielundsvägen 8 S-585 97 Linköping / SE | 03 /
LUDWIG, Reiner Bergstrasse 18 52393 Huertgenwald / DE | 04 /
MEYER, Michael Grossheidstrasse 27 52080 Aachen / DE | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | von Zmuda-Trzebiatowski, Margarethe Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | von Zmuda-Trzebiatowski, Margarethe Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2007/17] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04740432.2 | 29.06.2004 | [2007/17] | WO2004EP07043 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006002658 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1776797 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1776797 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L1/00 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
H04L1/1819 (EP,US);
H04L1/0013 (EP,US);
H04L1/0069 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON PAKETBASIERTEN DATEN SOWIE ÜBERTRAGUNG UND EMPFANG | [2009/07] | English: | PACKET-BASED DATA PROCESSING TECHNIQUE, TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION | [2009/07] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE TRAITEMENT, TRANSMISSION ET RECEPTION DE DONNEES FONDEE SUR DES PAQUETS | [2009/07] |
Former [2007/17] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON PAKETBASIERTEN DATEN SOWIE ÜBERTRAGUNG | ||
Former [2007/17] | PACKET-BASED DATA PROCESSING TECHNIQUE AND TRANSMISSION | ||
Former [2007/17] | TECHNIQUE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES FONDEE SUR DES PAQUETS | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.2009 | BE | 05.08.2009 | CY | 05.08.2009 | CZ | 05.08.2009 | DK | 05.08.2009 | EE | 05.08.2009 | FI | 05.08.2009 | IT | 05.08.2009 | NL | 05.08.2009 | PL | 05.08.2009 | RO | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | SI | 05.08.2009 | SK | 05.08.2009 | TR | 05.08.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | GR | 06.11.2009 | ES | 16.11.2009 | PT | 05.12.2009 | HU | 06.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CY | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CY | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0938207 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-24 * page 4, line 56 - page 5, line 33 * * page 5, line 48 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 13 - line 24 * * page 6, line 37 - line 40 * * page 8, line 58 - page 9, line 12 * * page 9, line 31 - line 50 * * page 10, line 3 - line 20; figures 2,4; tables 1,2 *; | [X]WO0217550 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-6,8,9,13-24 * page 11, line 5 - line 18; figures 4,6 * * page 12, line 9 - page 14, line 15 ** page 19, line 9 - page 20, line 11 *; | [X]US2003097629 (MOON YONG-SUK [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-24 * page 1, column L, paragraph 5 * * page 2, column L, paragraphs 14,15 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 19 * * page 5, column L, paragraph 51 * * page 5, column R, paragraphs 56,57 * * page 6, column L, paragraph 63 * * page 7, column R, paragraphs 73,74 * * page 8, column R, paragraphs 82,83 * * page 9, column R, paragraph 92 * |