EP1648733 - SEAT AND METHOD FOR TILTING A SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls GmbH Industriestrasse 20-30 51399 Burscheid / DE | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATKINS, Dave 1 Beech AV. Calegreen Stockport / GB | 02 /
SCHMODDE, Hans Berggasse 37/4 71034 Dagersheim / DE | 03 /
SCHÜLE, Robert Theodor-Storm Strasse 11 71034 Dagersheim / DE | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Brosch, Oliver Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Brosch, Oliver Kutzenberger & Wolff, Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04740526.1 | 01.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004EP07159 | Priority number, date | DE20031032762 | 17.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10332762 | [2006/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005016686 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648733 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/36, B60N2/22, B60N2/30 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
B60N2/305 (EP,US);
B60N2/3013 (EP,US);
B60N2/309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SITZ UND VERFAHREN ZUM UMKLAPPEN EINES SITZES | [2006/17] | English: | SEAT AND METHOD FOR TILTING A SEAT | [2006/17] | French: | SIEGE ET PROCEDE POUR RABATTRE OU RELEVER UN SIEGE | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 27.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19951722 (FAURE BERTRAND SITZTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US4382629 (FROUMAJOU ARMAND [FR]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5641202 (RUS LIVIU [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * figures 1-3 * |