EP1651341 - REACTOR BOTTOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bavarian Nordic A/S Bo̸geskovvej 9 3490 Kvistgaard / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Bavarian Nordic A/S Bögeskovvej 9 3490 Kvistgaard / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGEL, Alexander Würzburger Str. 44 97204 Höchberg / DE | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Konnerth, Dieter Hans Fischer & Konnerth Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Schertlinstrasse 18 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Konnerth, Dieter Hans Wiese & Konnerth Georgenstrasse 6 82152 Planegg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04741243.2 | 23.07.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004EP08260 | Priority number, date | DE2003134371 | 25.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10334371 | [2006/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005011857 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1651341 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/04, B01J2/06, B01J8/00, C12N11/04 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
B01J13/04 (EP,US);
B01J2/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | 22.02.2006 | HR | 22.02.2006 | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | 22.02.2006 | Title | German: | REAKTORBODEN EINES REAKTORS | [2006/18] | English: | REACTOR BOTTOM | [2006/18] | French: | FOND D'UN REACTEUR | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 12.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/07] | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB685371 (NORTH THAMES GAS BOARD, et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 12 - line 16 * * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 129; figures 1,2 * [Y] 16-19; | [X]US3690842 (LOCKWOOD LAWRENCE S) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 66; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19923628 (HUETTLIN HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-19* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE10024154 (INOTECH ENCAPSULATION AG DOTTI [CH]) [Y] 16-19 * column 3, line 10 - line 64; figure 1 * |